MA H4155 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Consolidated with H4022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Consolidated with H4022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate Route 1, Route 20 and Route 6 as historic United States routes. Transportation.
Title
To historic route designations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Consolidated with H4022 |
2018-05-09 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-09 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H1841 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3782
H4022 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted, see H4713
H3685 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3960
H1804 (Similar To) 2017-12-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1783 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2718 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4022 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted, see H4713
H3685 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3960
H1804 (Similar To) 2017-12-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1783 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2718 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4155 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4155.pdf |