MA H4156 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3851
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a highway buffer zone in the town of Needham
Title
Providing for a highway buffer zone in the town of Needham
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | House | Placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-08-11 | House | For message, see H4397 |
2014-08-08 | Governor returned to the House with veto | |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-31 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-30 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-06-16 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-06-09 | House | New draft of H3851 |
2014-06-09 | House | Pending new draft of H3851 |
2014-06-09 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H3851 (Replaces) 2014-06-09 - New draft substituted, see H4156
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4156 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4156.pdf |