MA H4160 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on adoption
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-20 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on adoption
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to debt-free higher education at public colleges and universities. Higher Education.
Title
Resolutions supporting efforts to ensure that students from Massachusetts have access to debt-free higher education at public colleges and universities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on adoption |
2016-05-19 | House | Resolutions reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H227 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4160 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4160.pdf |