MA H4173 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for a transportation excise tax to be paid by certain employers. Revenue.
Title
Providing for a corporate transportation excise tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5279 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-09-30 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S179 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3066 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S78 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H2874 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1848 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3063 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S179 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
H3066 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S78 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
H2874 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S1848 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H3063 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4173 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4173.pdf |