MA H4174 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Farley-Bouvier of Pittsfield and Senator Mark, a joint petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Tricia Farley-Bouvier and Paul W. Mark that the Massachusetts Department of Transportation be authorized to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Pittsfield to the Diocese of Springfield. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the Massachusetts Department of Transportation to convey a certain parcel of land in the city of Pittsfield
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/11/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-11-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-11-08 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2023-10-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4645 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4701 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4646 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4723 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4795 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4701 (Similar To) 2024-06-03 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
H4646 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4723 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4795 (Similar To) 2024-06-27 - Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4174 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4174.pdf |