MA H4183 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Published as amended, see H4196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Published as amended, see H4196
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing tobacco control
Title
Modernizing tobacco control
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-13 - House - House On Engrossment Yea and Nay No. 130 (Y: 127 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-13 - House - House on adoption of amendment #9 Yea and Nay No. 129 (Y: 32 N: 126 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-13 - House - House On Recommittal Yea and Nay No. 126 (Y: 36 N: 123 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-13 - House - House on adoption of amendment #9 Yea and Nay No. 129 (Y: 32 N: 126 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-13 - House - House On Recommittal Yea and Nay No. 126 (Y: 36 N: 123 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Published as amended, see H4196 |
2019-11-13 | House | Amendment 15 adopted |
2019-11-13 | House | Amendment 5 adopted, as changed |
2019-11-13 | House | Amendment 9 rejected - 32 YEAS to 126 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 129) |
2019-11-13 | House | Quorum Roll Call - 153 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No.128) |
2019-11-13 | House | Amendment 9 pending |
2019-11-13 | House | Amendment 12 adopted |
2019-11-13 | House | Amendment 4 adopted |
2019-11-13 | House | Amendment 2 rejected |
2019-11-13 | House | Quorum Roll Call - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No.127) |
2019-11-13 | House | Motion to recommit negatived - 36 YEAS to 123 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No.126) |
2019-11-13 | House | Read third |
2019-11-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Order adopted, see H4185 |
2019-11-12 | House | New draft of H4089 |
2019-11-12 | House | Pending new draft of H4089 |
2019-11-12 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4089 (Replaces) 2019-11-12 - New draft substituted, see H4183
H4185 (Replaced by) 2019-11-12 - Adopted
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1902 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4089
H9 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H738 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
H4196 (Replaced by) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019
H4185 (Replaced by) 2019-11-12 - Adopted
H255 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H1902 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4089
H9 (Similar To) 2019-10-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H738 (Similar To) 2020-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5012
H4196 (Replaced by) 2019-11-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 133 of the Acts of 2019
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4183 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4183.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/Journal/House/191/RollCalls/hj11132019_RollCalls.pdf |