MA H419 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2382
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-14)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2382
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ivory and rhino horn trafficking. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to ivory and rhino horn trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2382 |
2017-09-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/03/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H986 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H976 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S837 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S450 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2382
S2151 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
S2382 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2553
S2575 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2598 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2599 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Reprinted as amended, see S2621
S2621 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H985 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H976 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S837 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
S450 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2382
S2151 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - See S3
S2382 (Replaced by) 2018-06-21 - New draft substituted, see S2553
S2575 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2598 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2599 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Reprinted as amended, see S2621
S2621 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H419 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H419.pdf |