MA H419 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to school building assistance for certain approved school project. Education.
Title
Ensuring equitable MSBA incentives
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D] | Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D] | Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Rep. Paul Tucker [D] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Sen. Barry Finegold [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H527 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S249 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S346 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H533 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H451 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3919 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S249 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S346 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H533 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H451 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H3919 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H419 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H419.pdf |