MA H4196 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4694
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to health insurance and other benefits in the town of Phillipston
Title
Relative to the provision of health insurance and other benefits in the Town of Phillipston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 246 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-07-30 | Enacted and laid before the Governor | |
2010-07-30 | Enacted | |
2010-07-29 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-29 | Taken out of the Orders of the Day | |
2010-07-28 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-23 | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session | |
2010-07-22 | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-07-13 | Read second and ordered to a third reading | |
2010-07-12 | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading | |
2010-07-06 | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Committee On Steering, Policy and Scheduling | |
2010-06-15 | Discharged from committee and recommitted to the committee on Joint Committee on Public Service | |
2010-06-15 | Reported on a part of H4694 | |
2010-05-25 | Accompanied a study order, see H4694 | |
2009-08-10 | Senate concurred | |
2009-08-06 | Referred to the committee on Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4694 (Replaced by) 2010-09-02 - Reported, in part, by H01881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4196 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=7283&generalCourtId=2 |