MA H4200 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4488
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-9)
Status: Introduced on June 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4488
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the scheduling of high school athletic contests. Education.
Title
Relative to the scheduling of high school athletic contests
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4488 |
2014-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2014 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Education |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4488 (Replaced by) 2014-09-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4200 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4200.pdf |