MA H4200 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4199
Note: Legislation replaced by H4201
Note: Legislation replaced by H4201
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Published as amended, see H4201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-27 - Published as amended, see H4201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2017 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements
Title
Making appropriations for the fiscal year 2017 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Published as amended, see H4201 |
2016-04-27 | House | Passed to be engrossed 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 244) |
2016-04-27 | House | Quorum Roll Call 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 243) |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 1293 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-27 | House | Consolidated amendment I (Labor and Economic Development) adopted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 242) |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 409 adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | Further amendment rejected |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 409 pending |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 646 rejected |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 152 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 1260 adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 729 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 626 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 915 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-27 | House | Consolidated amendment H (Public Safety and Judiciary) adopted 159 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 241) |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 805 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 255 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 445 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider amendment 645 negative |
2016-04-27 | House | Quorum Roll Call 150 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 240) |
2016-04-27 | House | Motion to reconsider amendment 645 prevails |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 613 rejected |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 645 rejected |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 639 rejected |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 837 adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 301 adopted |
2016-04-27 | House | Amendment 854 adopted |
2016-04-26 | House | Consolidated amendment G (Health and Human Services and Elder Affairs) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 239) |
2016-04-26 | House | Consolidated amendment F (Public Health) adopted, as changed 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 238) |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 685 rejected 40 YEAS to 117 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 237) |
2016-04-26 | House | Quorum Roll Call 146 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 236) |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 397 adopted |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 389 adopted |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 117 adopted |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 653 adopted, as changed |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 458 adopted, as changed 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 235) |
2016-04-26 | House | Consolidated amendment E (Housing, Mental Health and Disability Services) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 234) |
2016-04-26 | House | Further amendment adopted, precluding vote |
2016-04-26 | House | Quorum Roll Call 148 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 233) |
2016-04-26 | House | Further amendment pending |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 1130 pending |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 630 rejected |
2016-04-26 | House | Amendment 143 rejected |
2016-04-26 | House | Quorum Roll Call 146 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 232) |
2016-04-26 | House | Consolidated amendment C (Energy and Environmental Affairs) adopted - 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 231) |
2016-04-26 | House | Consolidated amendment D (Social Services and Veterans) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 230) |
2016-04-25 | House | Consolidated amendment B (Constitutional Officers, State Administration and Transportation) adopted - 158 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 229) |
2016-04-25 | House | Consolidated amendment A (Education and Local Aid) adopted 157 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 228) |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 608 rejected 34 YEAS to 124 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 227) |
2016-04-25 | House | Suspension of Rule 1A 125 YEAS to 32 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 226) |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 608 pending |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 427 rejected 37 YEAS to 121 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 225) |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 383 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 1031 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 107 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 1262 rejected |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 33 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 457 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 508 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 657 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 658 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 3 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 585 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 465 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 249 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 13 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 443 rejected 35 YEAS to 121 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 224) |
2016-04-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-04-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-04-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 1090 rejected |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 795 rejected |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 612 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Further amendment adopted 116 YEAS to 42 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 222) |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 612 pending |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 449 adopted |
2016-04-25 | House | Further amendment adopted 120 YEAS to 38 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 221) |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 449 pending |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 26 rejected |
2016-04-25 | House | Amendment 814 rejected |
2016-04-25 | House | Read second |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Monday, April 25, 2016 for a second reading |
2016-04-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-04-13 | House | Order adopted, see H4199 |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported on a part of H2 |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4199 (Replaced by) 2016-04-13 - Adopted 116 YEAS to 34 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 217)
H4201 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H4451
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
H4201 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H4451
H65 (Similar To) 2015-03-31 - Reported by H3333
H66 (Similar To) 2015-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2015
H3189 (Similar To) 2015-05-04 - Reported by H3353
H3203 (Similar To) 2015-03-30 - House insisted on its amendment
H3773 (Similar To) 2015-09-30 - Published as amended, see H3785
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4200 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4200.pdf |