MA H4201 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act designating the street hockey arena in Marine Park in the South Boston section of the city of Boston By Mr. Collins of Boston, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Nick Collins that the Department of Conservation and Recreation designate the street hockey arena in the city of Boston as the Donald F. Higgins Memorial Street Hockey Arena. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Designating the street hockey arena in Marine Park in the South Boston section of the city of Boston
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 386 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-11-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-11-24 | House | Enacted |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-08-05 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-07-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2014 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-16 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
2014-06-11 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4201 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4201.pdf |