MA H4202 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to amend the charter of the town of Westborough. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Westborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 87 of the Acts of 2024 | |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2024-04-22 | House | Enacted |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-01-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-12-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-11-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-11-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-11-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H4847 (Similar To) 2024-08-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5003 (Similar To) 2024-08-16 - Senate concurred
H5003 (Similar To) 2024-08-16 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4202 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4202.pdf |