MA H421 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4298
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to regional school out-of-district placements. Education.
Title
Relative to out of district placements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4298 |
2015-05-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4298 (Replaced by) 2016-05-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H419 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2573 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H420 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H4482 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
H419 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H2573 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H420 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
H4482 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H421 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H421.pdf |