MA H421 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to requiring food allergen certification in vocational schools. Education.
Title
Requiring food allergen certification in vocational schools
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5159 |
2019-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H811 (Similar To) 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5090
H407 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H466 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H2009 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1877
H1475 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1354 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2808
S444 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S119 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Accompanied H196
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2449 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2450 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H407 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H466 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H2009 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied H1877
H1475 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1354 (Similar To) 2020-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2808
S444 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S2023 (Similar To) 2019-12-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S119 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Accompanied H196
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2449 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2450 (Similar To) 2019-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5159 (Replaced by) 2020-12-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H421 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H421.pdf |