MA H4211 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to amending the charter of the town of Westborough. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Amending the charter of the town of Westborough.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-11 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 298 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-10-04 | House | Enacted |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-01 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2012-08-23 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-08-20 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for a second reading |
2012-07-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4211 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=118808&generalCourtId=1 |