MA H4221 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish rent board for the purpose of regulating rents for the use or occupancy of manufactured housing accommodations in the town of Acushnet. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
PROVIDING FOR THE ESTABLISHMENT AND ADMINISTRATION OF RENT REGULATIONS AND THE CONTROL OF EVICTIONS IN MANUFACTURED HOUSING COMMUNITIES IN THE TOWN OF ACUSHNET
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2012-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-07-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for a second reading |
2012-07-26 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-07-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/19/2012 from 11:30 AM-12:30 PM in B-2 |
2012-07-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-07-19 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2012-07-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-06-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4221 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119325&generalCourtId=1 |