MA H4222 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 349 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 349 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the town of Whately to continue the employment of Donald Dufault and John DuBois By Representative Kulik of Worthington and Senator Rosenberg, a joint petition of Stephen Kulik and Stanley C. Rosenberg (by vote of the town) that the town of Whately be authorized to continue the employment of Donald Dufault and John DuBois. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Whately to continue the employment of Donald Dufault and John DuBois
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 349 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-10-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-10-09 | House | Enacted |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-09-25 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-09-22 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4222 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4222.pdf |