MA H4229 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5204
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Boston be authorized to regulate the rent for the use or occupancy of certain governmentally-involved or formerly governmentally-involved housing in said city. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
To restore Boston's governmentally-involved housing protection
Sponsors
Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Jon Santiago [D] | Rep. Rob Consalvo [D] | Sen. Lydia Edwards [D] |
Rep. Edward Coppinger [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Adrian Madaro [D] | Sen. Liz Miranda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5204 |
2022-05-12 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 9, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday March 8, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2022-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-10-28 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S1774 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S2024 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H5204 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S749 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied H1246
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
S2257 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S33 (Similar To) 2021-04-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 10 of the Acts of 2021
S1565 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2764
S2024 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2681
H5204 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S749 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied H1246
H865 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5041
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4229 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4229.pdf |