MA H4242 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - New draft substituted, see H4642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - New draft substituted, see H4642
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the future information technology needs of Massachusetts
Title
To provide for the future information technology needs of Massachusetts
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | New draft substituted, see H4642 |
2024-05-15 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2024-05-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2024-05-15 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2024-05-15 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4642 |
2024-02-12 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2024-01-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-01-10 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
Same As/Similar To
H4642 (Similar To) 2024-05-15 - Published as amended, see H4648
H4648 (Similar To) 2024-07-19 - Reported by H4889
H4889 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2024
H4648 (Similar To) 2024-07-19 - Reported by H4889
H4889 (Similar To) 2024-07-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 139 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4242 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4242.pdf |