MA H4247 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 205 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 205 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the compensation of the Soldiers' Memorial Commission of the city of Holyoke
Title
Relative to the compensation of the Soldiers' Memorial Commission of the city of Holyoke
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | Senate | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 205 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-24 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-07-24 | House | Enacted |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-07-10 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-03 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-06-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2014-06-30 | House | Substituted for H4029 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4247 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4247.pdf |