MA H4260 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-02 - House concurred
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Decker of Cambridge, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Marjorie C. Decker for the issuance of an annual proclamation by the Governor to designate September 14 as plastic pollution action day. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing plastic pollution action day in the commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules |
2020-01-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-12-19 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-12-11 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H771 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3945
H751 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
H1958 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H874 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S490 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
H751 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
H1958 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H874 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5073
S490 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3976
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4260 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4260.pdf |