MA H4273 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H440
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a green banks program
Title
Establishing a green banks program
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-03-06 | House | New draft of H440 |
2018-03-06 | House | Reported from the committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H440 (Replaces) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H4115 (Similar To) 2018-11-06 - Approved by the People at the state election, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2018
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H4665 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4914 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2018
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4115 (Similar To) 2018-11-06 - Approved by the People at the state election, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2018
H1647 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1866 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied H1856
H155 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2656 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2059 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H4665 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4914 (Similar To) 2018-12-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 319 of the Acts of 2018
H4971 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4273 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4273.pdf |