MA H428 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to underground storage tank financial reimbursement for damages caused by negligent releases. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to underground storage tanks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-10-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H429 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H452 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H2907 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
H452 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4532
H2907 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4529
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H428 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H428.pdf |