MA H4284 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5089
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H5089
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to rent regulation and the control of evictions in mobile home park accommodations in the town of Plainville. Housing. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Providing for rent regulation and control of evictions in mobile home park accommodations in the town of Plainville
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5089 |
2020-01-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2020-01-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H5089 (Replaced by) 2020-11-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4284 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4284.pdf |