MA H4307 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S1144
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Granting equal access to original birth certificates to all persons born in Massachusetts
Title
Granting equal access to original birth certificates to all persons born in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-05-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-05-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-05-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-18 | House | New draft of S1144 and H2045 |
2016-05-18 | House | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1144 (Replaces) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4307
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
H3699 (Similar To) 2016-06-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3700 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H3701 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
S1993 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - New draft substituted, see S2074
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4307 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4307.pdf |