MA H4323 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H878
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 445 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on January 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 445 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to property and casualty actuarial opinions and reports
Title
Relative to property and casualty actuarial opinions and reports
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 445 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-12-29 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-12-29 | House | Enacted |
2014-12-29 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-12-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-12-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2014-12-08 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-22 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-22 | House | Substituted for H878 |
2014-07-21 | House | New draft of H878 |
2014-07-21 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H878 (Replaces) 2014-07-22 - New draft substituted, see H4323
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4323 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4323.pdf |