MA H4326 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4506
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reported on the residue by H4803
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reported on the residue by H4803
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges
Title
Financing improvements to municipal roads and bridges
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reported on the residue by H4803 |
2020-02-26 | House | Reported, in part, by H4506 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing scheduled for 02/06/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4506 (Replaced by) 2020-03-05 - Published as amended, see H4547
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4326 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4326.pdf |