MA H433 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4582
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-08-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4582
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require the disclosure to parents of standardized student assessments from kindergarten through twelfth grade. Education.
Title
Requiring school districts, with the assistance of the department of elementary and secondary education, to disclose information about required assessments
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Linda Campbell [D] | Rep. Paul Heroux [D] | Sen. Joan Lovely [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4582 |
2015-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4582 (Replaced by) 2016-08-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1804 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3038 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
H526 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4535
H1804 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H2009 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1805 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H3038 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4470
H526 (Similar To) 2016-07-25 - New draft substituted, see H4535
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H433 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H433.pdf |