MA H4337 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4165
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on August 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Clinton to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to 1044 Main Street Clinton LLC
Title
Authorizing the town of Clinton to grant a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages to 1044 Main Street Clinton LLC
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Rep. Harold Naughton [D] | Sen. Dean Tran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 161 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-08-17 | House | Enacted |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-11 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-02-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-01-30 | House | New draft of H4165 |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4165 (Replaces) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4337
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4337 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4337.pdf |