MA H4344 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 266 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 266 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Bill Title: An Act authorizing the division of capital asset management to transfer care, custody and control of a certain parcel of land in the town of Sandwich in exchange for certain parcels of land in the town of Bourne and Sandwich By Mr. Hunt of Sandwich, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Randy Hunt that the Division of Capital Asset Management and Maintenence be authorized to transfer certain parcels of land in the towns of Bourne and Sandwich. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Authorizing the division of capital asset management to transfer care, custody and control of a certain parcel of land in the town of Sandwich in exchange for certain parcels of land in the town of Bourne and Sandwich
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-08 | House | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 266 of the Acts of 2014 |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Enacted -see Roll Call #472 [Yeas 40 - Nays 0] |
2014-07-31 | House | Enacted 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 484) |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-31 | House | Bills in the Third Reading special report accepted |
2014-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-07-31 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-30 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/30/2014 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-07-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-23 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4344 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4344.pdf |