MA H4347 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H3413
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to autocycle motor vehicle definition and operating requirements
Title
Relative to autocycle motor vehicle definition and operating requirements
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2018-03-29 | House | New draft of H3413 |
2018-03-29 | House | Reported from the committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3413 (Replaces) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4347
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H759 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4140 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H4338 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4721
H38 (Similar To) 2018-01-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4099
H1807 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H3441 (Similar To) 2018-06-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4649
H1302 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H759 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4347 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4347.pdf |