MA H4353 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4690
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to condominium owners' rights. Housing.
Title
To protect condominium unit owners’ constitutional right
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4690 |
2016-06-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/21/2016 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-05-26 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H4690 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1355 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1719 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H2134 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H290 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H867 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1355 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1719 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H2134 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H290 (Similar To) 2016-05-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4305
H867 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4353 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4353.pdf |