MA H4366 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-01 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Lunenburg be authorized to grant one additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Lunenburg to grant an additional license for the sale of wines and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
Rep. Stephan Hay [D] | Sen. Dean Tran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | House concurred |
2020-04-27 | House | House concurred |
2020-02-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 02/19/2020 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4366 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4366.pdf |