MA H4377 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-14 - Sections 52, 65 ,97, 101 and 115 referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-14 - Sections 52, 65 ,97, 101 and 115 referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promoting economic growth across the Commonwealth
Title
Promoting economic growth across the Commonwealth
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | House | Sections 52, 65 ,97, 101 and 115 referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-08-14 | House | For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4403 for section 90 |
2014-08-14 | House | For actions on the sections returned with recommendations of amendments, see H4402 for sections 51, 64 and 98 |
2014-08-14 | House | For messages, see House Nos. 4404, H4405 and H4406 |
2014-08-13 | House | Governor returned to the House with veto of sections 52, 65, 97, 101 and 115 and amendments to certain sections |
2014-08-13 | Signed (in part) by the Governor, Chapter 287 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Enacted - Roll Call #491 [YEAS 40 - NAYS 0] |
2014-08-01 | House | Enacted 144 YEAS to 9 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 504) |
2014-08-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-08-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Committee of conference report accepted, in concurrence |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | House | Committee of conference report accepted |
2014-07-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-07-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2014-07-30 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-07-30 | House | Reported by committee of conference, see H4181 |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4377 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4377.pdf |