MA H4382 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 313 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 313 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the 2016 special town election in the town of East Longmeadow.
Title
Validating the results of a certain election in the town of East Longmeadow
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 313 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-11-10 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-11-10 | House | Enacted |
2016-11-07 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-11-07 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-10-20 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2016-07-28 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-07-28 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-07-28 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-07-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-08 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S1 (Similar To) 2015-01-08 - Placed on file
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
H49 (Similar To) 2015-02-11 - Reported, in part, by H52
H55 (Similar To) 2015-04-17 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2015
H59 (Similar To) 2016-01-06 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 165 of the Acts of 2015
H60 (Similar To) 2015-03-26 - Reported, in part, by H3203
H4756 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 393 of the Acts of 2016
H4755 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - See H2319
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4382 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4382.pdf |