MA H441 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4050
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4050
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4050
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the Commissioner of the Department of Agricultural Resources to establish a livestock care and standards board to ensure the humane keeping and treatment of livestock. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To promote the care and well-being of livestock
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4050 |
2017-09-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H416 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H2905 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H4050 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2905 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4530
H4050 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H441 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H441.pdf |