MA H4416 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4161
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Dedham to convert a license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises to a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Title
Authorizing the town of Dedham to convert a license for the sale of wine and malt beverages not to be drunk on the premises to a license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-07 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-19 | House | New draft of H4161 |
2018-04-19 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4161 (Replaces) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4416
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H3466 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3755
H2817 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H2787 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3788
H2793 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3753
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H3466 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3755
H2817 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H2787 (Similar To) 2017-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3788
H2793 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3753
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4416 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4416.pdf |