MA H4436 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Donato of Medford, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Paul J. Donato that the State Board of Retirement be authorized to establish a retirement incentive for certain Trial Court employees. Public Service.
Title
Relative to Trial Court reporters
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-06-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2016 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-06-22 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-06-20 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H2976 (Similar To) 2016-01-11 - Accompanied H3095
H1833 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H983 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H650 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4653
H177 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H4752 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
H1833 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H983 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H650 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4653
H177 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - Senate concurred
H4752 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4769
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4436 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4436.pdf |