MA H4442 | 2009-2010 | 186th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4340
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2010
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey certain land to the town of Concord
Title
Authorizing the commissioner of capital asset management and maintenance to convey certain land to the town of Concord housing development corporation for affordable housing and open space.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 117 of the Acts of 2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Laid before the Governor | |
2010-05-27 | Enacted 38 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Senate Roll Call, No. 262) | |
2010-05-26 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Enacted 152 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See Yea and Nay in Supplement, | |
2010-05-26 | Emergency preamble adopted | |
2010-05-20 | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-05-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-05-20 | Committee recommended ought to pass | |
2010-02-01 | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Committee On Ways and Means | |
2010-01-28 | Read third and passed to be engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-28 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-28 | New draft of H4340 | |
2010-01-28 | Recommended new draft for H4340 | |
2010-01-28 | Reported from the committee on House Committee On Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H4340 (Replaces) 2010-01-28 - New draft substituted, see H4442
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/186/House/H4442 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=8169&generalCourtId=2 |