MA H4442 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H904
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-11-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-11-1)
Status: Passed on August 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Further regulating the enforcement of illegal hunting practices
Title
Further regulating the enforcement of illegal hunting practices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-04 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 145 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-07-26 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-07-26 | House | Enacted |
2022-07-26 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2022-07-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S2993 |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Read second |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-07-11 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S2993 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-02-09 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-02-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-02-09 | House | New draft of H904 |
2022-02-09 | House | Pending new draft of H904 |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H904 (Replaces) 2022-02-10 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
S587 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H904
S587 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Accompanied H904
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4442 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4442.pdf |