MA H4444 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the title of the director of information technology in the town of Westborough. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the charter of the town of Westborough
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 261 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-10-01 | House | Enacted |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-06-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-05-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-05-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-05-17 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
H1097 (Similar To) 2017-09-28 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3930
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2018
H2423 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2018
H3688 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3758
H3725 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2018
H4948 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 341 of the Acts of 2018
S2682 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4948
S1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 147 of the Acts of 2018
H2423 (Similar To) 2018-07-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 143 of the Acts of 2018
H3688 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3758
H3725 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2018
H4948 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 341 of the Acts of 2018
S2682 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - See H4948
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4444 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4444.pdf |