MA H4446 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Kathryn Woessner, an employee of the Department of Correction. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Kathryn Woessner, an employee of the Department of Correction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-09 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 322 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-10-30 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-10-30 | House | Enacted |
2012-10-30 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-10-30 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2012-10-01 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-09-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-09-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-09-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-09-27 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-09-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-08-13 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2012-07-26 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4446 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119521&generalCourtId=1 |