MA H4451 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to amending the charter of the town of Middleton to provide for the appointment of two alternate members of the planning board of said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Relative to the Middleton town charter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 375 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-11-13 | House | Enacted |
2014-11-10 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2014-11-03 | Senate | Read second, amended, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-11-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-10-02 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2014-09-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-09-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-09-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-09-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-09-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-09-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H4451 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H4451.pdf |