MA H4457 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate certain pavilions in the city of Revere as the Norman Gautreau memorial pavilions. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Designating 2 pavilions in the city of Revere as the Norman Gautreau Memorial Pavilions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 353 of the Acts of 2012 | |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2012-11-30 | House | Enacted |
2012-11-26 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-11-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2012-11-26 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2012-10-11 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2012-10-09 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2012-10-04 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2012-10-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2012-10-04 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2012-10-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2012-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2012 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in B-1 |
2012-09-27 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2012-09-20 | House | Reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
2012-09-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H4457 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=119791&generalCourtId=1 |