MA H4459 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substituted by the House, on motion of Mr. Speliotis of Danvers, for a bill with the same title (House, No. 3982). April 30, 2018.
Title
Authorizing the Town of Danvers to grant 10 additional licenses for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-02 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-10-25 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-10-25 | House | Enacted |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read; and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2018-04-30 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2018-04-30 | House | Substituted for H3982 |
Same As/Similar To
H3763 (Similar To) 2017-10-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3982
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4768 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2018
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H191 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S117 (Similar To) 2017-09-08 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/12/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S418 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2459
H3536 (Similar To) 2017-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3756
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4768 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2018
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4459 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H4459.pdf |