MA H4462 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4552
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the town of Dracut be authorized to grant four additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the town of Dracut to grant four additional licenses for the sale of alcoholic beverages to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4552 |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2016-07-05 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4552 (Replaced by) 2016-07-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4462 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4462.pdf |