MA H4477 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H4081
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on January 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the town of Arlington to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Title
Authorizing the town of Arlington to establish a means tested senior citizen property tax exemption
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-07 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 285 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2021-01-04 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2021-01-04 | House | Enacted |
2020-12-29 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2020-12-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-12-28 | House | Referred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-06-29 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2020-05-26 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-05-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-05-26 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-02-27 | House | New draft of H4081 |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from the committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H4081 (Replaces) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4477
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4477 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H4477.pdf |