MA H4482 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4768
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
That the city of Springfield be authorized to continue the employment of Lawrence E. Akers as a police officer in said city. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Springfield to continue the employment of police officer Lawrence E. Akers
Sponsors
Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
Rep. Orlando Ramos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4768 |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-04-16 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 14, 2024, pending concurrence |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
H4768 (Replaced by) 2024-08-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 157 of the Acts of 2024
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4482 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H4482.pdf |