MA H4498 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H1859
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to transmitting indecent visual depictions by teens and the unlaw [sic] distribution of explicit images
Title
Relative to transmitting indecent visual depictions by teens and the unlaw [sic] distribution of explicit images
Sponsors
House House Committee on Ways and Means | Rep. Jeffrey Roy [D] | Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D] | Rep. Bradley Jones [R] |
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - House - House Passed to be engrossed - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2023-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Bills in the Third Reading), adopted |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Read third |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S3167 |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Read second |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2022-12-29 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S3167 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-05-26 | House | Passed to be engrossed - 154 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 190 ) |
2022-05-26 | House | Read third (title changed) |
2022-05-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-05-25 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-05-25 | House | New draft of H1859 |
2022-05-25 | House | Pending new draft of H1859 |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported from the committee on House Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H1859 (Replaces) 2022-05-25 - New draft substituted, see H4498
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4498 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H4498.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/HouseRollCall190.pdf |